Global Patent Index - EP 1007417 B1

EP 1007417 B1 2002-11-13 - PACKAGING BOX FOR FOOD PRODUCTS

Title (en)

PACKAGING BOX FOR FOOD PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSSCHACHTEL FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

BOITE D'EMBALLAGE POUR PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES

Publication

EP 1007417 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98902064 A

Priority

  • FR 9800049 W
  • FR 9700292 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2758312A1] The invention concerns a packaging box comprising a closed crown (1) provided with at least two opposite transverse windows (4), a base (3) and a lid (2) for closing said crown (1). The invention is characterised in that a) the lid (2) comprises a piece provided with a boss (5) for co-operating with the top opening of the crown (1) by fitting therein, and comprising at least two opposite side flaps (6) each provided with a boss (7) for co-operating with a window (4) of the crown (1) by fitting therein, and b) the base (3) comprises a piece provided with a boss (8) for co-operating with the lower opening of the crown (1) by fitting therein and two opposite projections or tabs (9) each provided with locking means (10) co-operating with complementary locking means (11) of one of the flaps (6) of the lid (2). The invention is applicable to the packaging of food products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/32 (2006.01); B65D 85/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/324 (2013.01); B65D 15/22 (2013.01); B65D 85/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2758312 A1 19980717; FR 2758312 B1 19990305; AU 5870498 A 19980803; DE 69809441 D1 20021219; DE 69809441 T2 20030710; EP 1007417 A1 20000614; EP 1007417 B1 20021113; ES 2184226 T3 20030401; US 6220507 B1 20010424; WO 9830457 A1 19980716

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GROUPE GUILLIN

- Effective date: 20050131

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GROUPE GUILLIN

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-01-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040106

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184226 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809441 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990802

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL