Global Patent Index - EP 1007434 A1

EP 1007434 A1 2000-06-14 - ARTICLE CARRIER HAVING BRACE TAB

Title (en)

ARTICLE CARRIER HAVING BRACE TAB

Title (de)

TRÄGER FÜR ARTIKEL MIT STÜTZLASCHE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PORTEUR D'ARTICLES POURVU DE LANGUETTES DE RENFORCEMENT

Publication

EP 1007434 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98935556 A

Priority

  • GB 9713947 A
  • US 9814075 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901356A1] A carton and carton blank (10) for forming a carton of the top gripping type for accommodating a plurality of containers, for example bottles, which carton is tubular in structure and comprises a first panel (16) having a plurality of apertures (34, 64), each of which has at least one foldable retention tab (30, 32) which operatively engages the underside of the radially protruding part (P1, P2) of a container (B) present in the aperture wherein a brace tab (54) is connected to one of said retention tabs and is disposed between a pair of adjacent containers to minimize relative movement between those containers and wherein a free end edge of said brace tab operatively engages the underside of the radially protruding part of one of said adjacent containers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 67/02 (2006.01); B65D 71/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901356A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901356 A1 19990114; AR 016306 A1 20010704; AT 226172 T 20021115; AU 8477698 A 19990125; BR 9810504 A 20000905; CA 2295965 A1 19990114; CA 2295965 C 20040113; CN 1081585 C 20020327; CN 1261852 A 20000802; CZ 298408 B6 20070926; CZ 9904760 A3 20010815; DE 69808782 D1 20021121; DE 69808782 T2 20030612; DK 1007434 T3 20030217; EP 1007434 A1 20000614; EP 1007434 B1 20021016; ES 2186187 T3 20030501; GB 9713947 D0 19970903; HK 1028387 A1 20030321; HU 0003301 A2 20010228; HU 0003301 A3 20010428; HU 223538 B1 20040928; IL 133690 A 20030410; IL 133690 D0 20010430; JP 2002507954 A 20020312; JP 4009328 B2 20071114; PL 184891 B1 20030131; PL 337798 A1 20000911; PT 1007434 E 20030228; RO 118070 B1 20030130

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140703

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69808782

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080206

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLCONE HIGH RIDGE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-07-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2005-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

2005-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC

- Free text: THE MEAD CORPORATION#COURTHOUSE PLAZA#NORTHEAST DAYTON, OH 45463 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC#ONE HIGH RIDGE PARK#STAMFORD, CT 06905 (US)

2004-12-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-07-02 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186187 T3

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-02-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404515

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808782 20021121

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000126

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226172 T 20021115

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000126