Global Patent Index - EP 1007452 A1

EP 1007452 A1 2000-06-14 - CONVEYOR APPARATUS

Title (en)

CONVEYOR APPARATUS

Title (de)

FÖRDEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF TRANSPORTEUR

Publication

EP 1007452 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98912162 A

Priority

  • CA 9800217 W
  • CA 2199885 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840293A1] Device for moving products from a receiving location (22) to delivery location (18) which comprises a frame (10), two sets of stairs (30, 32, 34, 36, 38, 40, 42) mounted on rectilinear, inclined slide bearings (64, 66) within the frame, a drive mechanism comprising a rocker assembly (76) connected to both sets of stairs to reciprocate the stairs upwardly and downwardly on bearings, one set of stairs moving upwardly as the other moves downwardly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 47/14; B65G 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 25/08 (2006.01); B65G 47/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/1471 (2013.01); B65G 25/08 (2013.01); B65G 2201/0282 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840293 A1 19980917; AU 6714198 A 19980929; DE 69817583 D1 20031002; EP 1007452 A1 20000614; EP 1007452 B1 20030827; US 2002005331 A1 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150313

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040313

2004-09-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-03-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040313

2003-11-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-11-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817583 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IE IT SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991115

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IE IT SE