Global Patent Index - EP 1007461 A1

EP 1007461 A1 2000-06-14 - BUCKLE FOLDER MACHINE WITH TWO OR THREE FOLDER POCKETS

Title (en)

BUCKLE FOLDER MACHINE WITH TWO OR THREE FOLDER POCKETS

Title (de)

STAUCHFALZWERK MIT ZWEI ODER DREI FALZTASCHEN

Title (fr)

PLIEUSE A POCHES COMPORTANT DEUX OU TROIS POCHES DE PLIAGE

Publication

EP 1007461 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98909278 A

Priority

  • DE 9800206 W
  • DE 19709643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19709643C1] The paper folding system has a block of folding rollers (5-8) and magazines (11,12) above and below the block to take the part folded sheets between fold operations. The input and output feeds of the block are in the same plane. This allows the folding block to be fitted either way up, and enables two types of folding pattern to be obtained without changing the input and output drives. In the one setting the first folding roller is below the feed line and in the others setting it is above the feed line. The drive for the block comes from a motor (24) and from selective gear wheels which couple to all or some of the folding rollers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/144 (2013.01); B65H 45/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840300A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19709643 C1 19980716; CA 2274041 A1 19980917; EP 1007461 A1 20000614; EP 1007461 B1 20020724; ES 2179468 T3 20030116; JP 2001521477 A 20011106; US 6224530 B1 20010501; WO 9840300 A1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804915

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120122

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120122

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110123

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110122

2011-09-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BOWE SYSTEC GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOEWE SYSTEC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOEWE SYSTEC AG, 86159 AUGSBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59804915

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-06-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110519 AND 20110525

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BOEWE SYSTEC GMBH

- Free text: BOEWE SYSTEC AG#WERNER-VON-SIEMENS-STRASSE 1#86159 AUGSBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BOEWE SYSTEC GMBH#WERNER-VON-SIEMENS-STR. 1#86159 AUGSBURG (DE)

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2003-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179468 T3

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804915 20020829

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OKELMANN, WALTER

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOERG, HELMUT

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990812

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE