Global Patent Index - EP 1007515 A1

EP 1007515 A1 2000-06-14 - ARYLPYRIDAZINONES AS PROSTAGLANDIN ENDOPEROXIDE H SYNTHASE BIOSYNTHESIS INHIBITORS

Title (en)

ARYLPYRIDAZINONES AS PROSTAGLANDIN ENDOPEROXIDE H SYNTHASE BIOSYNTHESIS INHIBITORS

Title (de)

ARYLPYRIDAZINONE ALS HEMMER DER BIOSYNTHESE DER PROSTAGLANDIN-ENDOPEROXID-H-SYNTHASE

Title (fr)

ARYLPYRIDAZINONES INHIBITRICES DE LA BIOSYNTHESE DE LA PROSTAGLANDINE ENDOPEROXYDE H SYNTHASE

Publication

EP 1007515 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938451 A

Priority

  • US 9816479 W
  • US 91702397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910331A1] The present invention describes pyridazinone compounds which are cyclooxygenase (COX) inhibitors, and in particular, are selective inhibitors of cyclooxygenase-2 (COX/2), COX-2 is the inducible isoform associated with inflammation, as opposed to the constitutive isoform, cyclooxygenase-1 (COX-1) which is an important "housekeeping" enzyme in many tissues, including the gastrointestinal (GI) tract and the kidneys. The selectivity of these compounds for COX-2 minimizes the unwanted GI and renal side-effects seen with currently marketed non-steroidal anti-inflammatory drugs (NSAIDs).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 237/14; A61K 31/50; C07D 237/18; C07D 401/06; C07D 403/06; C07D 405/06; C07D 409/06; C07D 413/06; C07F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 237/14 (2006.01); C07D 237/18 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 403/06 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/06 (2006.01); C07D 409/06 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 237/14 (2013.01); C07D 237/18 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 403/06 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/06 (2013.01); C07D 409/06 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 417/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910331A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910331 A1 19990304; BR 9812127 A 20000718; CA 2299300 A1 19990304; CA 2299300 C 20070417; CO 4970740 A1 20001107; EP 1007515 A1 20000614; TW I232216 B 20050511; ZA 9807555 B 19990223

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034062

2012-02-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110823

2011-02-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2011-01-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060926

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000322;SI PAYMENT 20000322