Global Patent Index - EP 1007538 A1

EP 1007538 A1 2000-06-14 - PROBES FOR THE DETECTION OF HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS

Title (en)

PROBES FOR THE DETECTION OF HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS

Title (de)

SONDEN ZUM NACHWEIS DES MENSCHLICHEN PAPPILLOMAVIRUS

Title (fr)

SONDES POUR LA DETECTION DES PAPILLOMAVIRUS HUMAINS

Publication

EP 1007538 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97918677 A

Priority

  • US 9706354 W
  • US 1542796 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9739010A1] The present invention provides probes for the human papillomaviruses HPV-18, HPV-33, HPV-35, HPV-39, HPV-45, HPV-51, HPV-52, HPV-58, HPV-59, HPV-68 (ME180), MM4/W13B and MM9/PAP238A which hybridize with the homologous regions of these HPVs' DNA. The present invention also provides probes for these human papillomaviruses which are capable of hybridizing with newly discovered variant regions of these HPVs' DNA.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07H 21/00; C12Q 1/68; C12Q 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/708 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9739010 A1 19971023; AU 2672597 A 19971107; EP 1007538 A1 20000614; EP 1007538 A4 20050824

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060502

2005-08-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 A

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/00 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/70 B

2003-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION ? UNM

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990408

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE