Global Patent Index - EP 1007616 A1

EP 1007616 A1 2000-06-14 - ADDITIVE GRANULES FOR MOULDED BODIES HAVING A DETERGENT AND CLEANING ACTION

Title (en)

ADDITIVE GRANULES FOR MOULDED BODIES HAVING A DETERGENT AND CLEANING ACTION

Title (de)

HILFSMITTELGRANULAT FÜR WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSAKTIVE FORMKÖRPER

Title (fr)

GRANULES ADJUVANTS POUR CORPS MOULES DETERGENTS ET LAVANTS

Publication

EP 1007616 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928312 A

Priority

  • CA 2290014 A
  • DE 19723028 A
  • EP 9803042 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723028A1] The invention relates to moulded bodies having a detergent and cleaning action, especially tablets such as those consisting of detergent, dishwashing product, stain remover or water-softener. Thanks to the use of the additive granules provided for by the invention, the disintegration rate of said tablets conforms to the requirements for use in domestic washing machines. Said additive granules contain 10 to 95 weight percent cellulose having a particle size of less than 100 mu m as well as 5 to 90 weight percent microcrystalline cellulose and/or one or several ingredients of detergents and cleaning agents. They are superior to known cellulose-based disintegrating additives in terms of their physical and washing properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/22; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855575A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723028 A1 19981210; AT 271596 T 20040815; CA 2290014 A1 20010517; CN 1259163 A 20000705; DE 29724283 U1 20001005; DE 59811697 D1 20040826; EP 1007616 A1 20000614; EP 1007616 B1 20040721; ES 2226143 T3 20050316; HU 0003067 A2 20010129; JP 2002502456 A 20020122; PL 337040 A1 20000731; SK 164499 A3 20000711; WO 9855575 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20081017

2009-03-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20081017

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-07-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KGPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KGPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-06-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KGPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226143

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811697

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL