Global Patent Index - EP 1007617 A1

EP 1007617 A1 2000-06-14 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MANNANASE AND PERCARBONATE

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MANNANASE AND PERCARBONATE

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MANNANASE UND PERCARBONAT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES COMPRENANT UNE MANNANASE ET DU PERCARBONATE

Publication

EP 1007617 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926514 A

Priority

  • EP 98926514 A
  • EP 97870120 A
  • US 9812023 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 3/38609 (2013.01); C11D 3/38636 (2013.01); C11D 3/38645 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909130A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29825084 U1 20040916; EP 1007617 A1 20000614; EP 1007617 B1 20021218

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070625

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070625

2007-09-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070625

2007-06-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-07 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.,

2003-11-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-11-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-11-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.,

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-11-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-11-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-06-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185172 T3

2003-03-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810309 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810309 P 20030130

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230013 T 20030115

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE