Global Patent Index - EP 1007662 A1

EP 1007662 A1 2000-06-14 - METHOD FOR INDUCTION OF APOPTOTIC CELL DEATH IN MALIGNANT CELLS, THROUGH REDUCTION OF THE RB TO APOPTOSIS INDUCING PROTEINS RATIO

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INDUCTION OF APOPTOTIC CELL DEATH IN MALIGNANT CELLS, THROUGH REDUCTION OF THE RB TO APOPTOSIS INDUCING PROTEINS RATIO

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR INDUKTION VON APOPTOTISCHEN ZELLTOT IN MALIGNANTEN ZELLEN ,DURCH VERMINDERUNG DER RB ZUR APOPTOSIS INDUZIERENDE PROTEINEN RATIO

Title (fr)

METHODE PERMETTANT DE PROVOQUER UNE MORT CELLULAIRE PROGRAMMEE DANS DES CELLULES MALIGNES PAR REDUCTION DU RAPPORT PROTEINES Rb/PROTEINES INDUISANT L'APOPTOSE

Publication

EP 1007662 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902970 A

Priority

  • DK 9800068 W
  • DK 18397 A
  • US 91922697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837190A1] The present invention relates to use of a vector containing genetic material for the preparation of a composition for the treatment of malignant disease, said vector, upon administration in a subject suffering from malignant disease, inducing apoptosis in malignant cells by reducing the ratio of the level of pRb protein to the level of an apoptosis-inducing protein in malignant cells, by reducing the level of pRb and increasing the level of the apoptosis-inducing protein, after having first achieved growth arrest of said malignant cells by inducing herein an inhibition of phosphorylation of the pRb protein. The invention further relates to specific vectors for efficient transfer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/47; C12N 15/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4747 (2013.01); C07K 14/4736 (2013.01); C07K 14/4746 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9837190A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837190 A1 19980827; AU 5983198 A 19980909; AU 732794 B2 20010503; CA 2283090 A1 19980827; CN 1248290 A 20000322; DE 1007662 T1 20010419; EP 1007662 A1 20000614; ES 2150891 T1 20001216; JP 2001524812 A 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030902

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEVELOGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FUER ENTWICKLUNGSBIOL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-19 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-12-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150891

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEPAVEC AG FUER GENTHERAPIE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STRAUSS, MICHAEL

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANDIG, VOLKER

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BARTEK, JIRI

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LUKAS, JIRI

2000-11-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2000-10-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2000-09-15 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990811

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL