Global Patent Index - EP 1007715 A2

EP 1007715 A2 2000-06-14 - ADENOVIRUS VECTORS CONTAINING HETEROLOGOUS TRANSCRIPTION REGULATORY ELEMENTS AND METHODS OF USING SAME

Title (en)

ADENOVIRUS VECTORS CONTAINING HETEROLOGOUS TRANSCRIPTION REGULATORY ELEMENTS AND METHODS OF USING SAME

Title (de)

ADENOVIRALE VEKTOREN, DIE HETEROLOGE REGULATORISCHE ELEMENTE FÜR DIE TRANSKRIPTION ENTHALTEN UND METHODEN FÜR IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

VECTEURS D'ADENOVIRUS CONTENANT DES ELEMENTS HETEROLOGUES REGULATEURS DE TRANSCRIPTION, ET LEUR PROCEDE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1007715 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98907702 A

Priority

  • US 9804080 W
  • US 3976297 P
  • US 3976397 P
  • US 5452397 P
  • US 3355698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839464A2] Replication-competent adenovirus vectors specific for target cells and methods of use of such viruses are provided. These adenoviruses comprise a first adenoviral gene under control of a cell specific heterologous (i.e., non-adenoviral) transcriptional regulatory element (TRE) and at least a second gene under control of a second heterologous TRE, where the heterologous TREs are different from each other in polynucleotide sequence but functional in the same cell. The adenoviral gene can be, for example, a gene required for adenoviral replication. The second gene can be, for example, a second adenoviral gene or a transgene, such as a gene which can contribute to cytotoxicity in the target cell. Adenoviral replication can be restricted to target cells in which the heterologous TREs are functional and thus, the adenovirus vectors can provide selective cytotoxicity to the target cells, particularly neoplastic cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86; C12N 5/10; A61K 48/00; A61K 47/48; C12N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/075 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01); C12N 11/08 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); C12N 15/861 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 7/00 (2013.01); A61K 35/761 (2013.01); A61K 47/6901 (2017.08); C12N 15/86 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10322 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10332 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10343 (2013.01); C12N 2830/00 (2013.01); C12N 2830/002 (2013.01); C12N 2830/008 (2013.01); C12N 2830/85 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839464 A2 19980911; WO 9839464 A3 19990107; WO 9839464 A8 19990401; AU 6345098 A 19980922; AU 744725 B2 20020228; CA 2283231 A1 19980911; CA 2283231 C 20080520; EP 1007715 A2 20000614; JP 2002514074 A 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070602

2006-10-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025130

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031016

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELL GENESYS, INC.

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990908

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE