Global Patent Index - EP 1007723 A1

EP 1007723 A1 2000-06-14 - METHODS FOR USING GRANZYMES AND BINDING MOLECULES THEREOF FOR TREATING DISEASES CHARACTERIZED BY ABNORMAL APOPTOSIS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR USING GRANZYMES AND BINDING MOLECULES THEREOF FOR TREATING DISEASES CHARACTERIZED BY ABNORMAL APOPTOSIS

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON GRANZYMEN UND FIXIERUNGSMOLEKÜLEN DAVON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN CHARKTERISIERT DURCH EINE ABNORMALE APOPTOSE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE GRANZYMES ET DE MOLECULES DE FIXATION DE CES DERNIERES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER DES MALADIES CARACTERISEES PAR UNE APOPTOSE ANORMALE

Publication

EP 1007723 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942081 A

Priority

  • US 9817022 W
  • US 5633397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909206A1] A method for determining if an animal is at risk for a disease resulting in abnormal apoptosis is described. An animal is provided and an aspect of metabolism or structure of a serine protease, e.g., a granzyme, or a serine protease binding molecule in the animal is evaluated. An abnormality in the aspect of the metabolism or structure is diagnostic of being at risk for a disease resulting in abnormal apoptosis. Also described are methods for evaluating an agent for use in modulating apoptosis, methods for effecting or inhibiting apoptosis in a cell, and methods for treating unwanted cell or infectious particle proliferation or treating an autoimmune disease or a transplant graft rejection in an animal. Pharmaceutical compositions are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/02; A61K 38/10; C12N 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6467 (2013.01); A61K 38/1709 (2013.01); A61K 38/177 (2013.01); G01N 33/5091 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); G01N 2333/96433 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909206 A1 19990225; CA 2298867 A1 19990225; EP 1007723 A1 20000614; EP 1007723 A4 20011128

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIEBERMAN, JUDY

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERESFORD, PAUL, J.

2001-11-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-11-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12Q 1/02 A, 7C 12N 1/38 B, 7A 61K 38/10 B, 7C 12Q 1/37 B, 7C 12Q 1/25 B, 7G 01N 33/50 B, 7A 61K 38/48 B, 7C 12N 9/64 B, 7A 61K 38/17 B

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB