Global patent index - EP 1007753 A1

EP 1007753 A1 2000-06-14 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ADHESIVE LAYER FOR A HEAT INSULATING LAYER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ADHESIVE LAYER FOR A HEAT INSULATING LAYER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER HAFTSCHICHT FÜR EINE WÄRMEDÄMMSCHICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE COUCHE ADHESIVE DESTINEE A UNE COUCHE CALORIFUGE

Publication

EP 1007753 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936366 A

Priority

  • DE 9901598 W
  • DE 19824792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824792A1] The invention relates to a method for producing an anticorrosive, oxidation-resistant layer that is applied on a component, whereby the method can be technically carried out in an easy and cost-effective manner and comprises the following steps: a) producing a slurry by mixing a powder containing at least one of the elements Cr, Ni or Ce with a binding agent; b) applying the slurry on the component; c) drying the slurry at ambient temperatures of up to 300 DEG C and d) aluminizing the slurry layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 10/30; C23C 10/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 10/30 (2006.01); C23C 10/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 10/30 (2013.01); C23C 10/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824792 A1 19991216; DE 19824792 B4 20050630; EP 1007753 A1 20000614; EP 1007753 B1 20020403; ES 2176003 T3 20021116; JP 2002517608 A 20020618; JP 4469083 B2 20100526; US 6709711 B1 20040323; WO 9963126 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2176003

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901109

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991218

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE