Global patent index - EP 1007772 A1

EP 1007772 A1 2000-06-14 - SPINNING ROTOR OF AN OPEN-END SPINNING MACHINE

Title (en)

SPINNING ROTOR OF AN OPEN-END SPINNING MACHINE

Title (de)

SPINNROTOR EINER OFFENEND-SPINNMASCHINE

Title (fr)

ROTOR A FILER DE METIER A FILER A FIBRES LIBEREES

Publication

EP 1007772 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910577 A

Priority

  • CZ 9800018 W
  • CZ 106397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845514A1] The invention refers to a spinning rotor of an open-end spinning machine for spinning the yarn with high proportion of up to 100% flax fibres. The spinning rotor comprises an inlet aperture (1) leading into a gradually widening gliding surface (2) which passes into an auxiliary gliding surface (21), which then passes into a collecting groove (3). The collecting groove (3), which comprises an overflow surface (31), a transfer surface (32) and a defining surface (33) passes steplessly into the inner surface (4) of the bottom (5) of the spinning rotor. The bottom (5) of the spinning rotor comprises ventilation channels (6), which pass through from the inner surface (4) of the bottom (5) of the spinning rotor to the outer surface (7) of the bottom (5) of the spinning rotor. The bottom (5) of the spinning rotor also includes the ventilation grooves (8) that connect the spinning rotor cavity with the ventilation channels (6). To each ventilation channel (6) leads one ventilation groove (8), the front surface of which (81) is inclined to the plane perpendicular to the axis of rotor rotation and passes into the inner surface (4) of the bottom (5) of the spinning rotor near into the defining surface (33) of the collecting surface (3). Each ventilation groove (8) is displaced with respect to the axis of symmetry of its related ventilation channel (6) in the direction opposite to the rotor rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845514A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845514 A1 19981015; AU 6494098 A 19981030; CZ 288214 B6 20010516; CZ 9701063 A3 19981014; DE 69812112 D1 20030417; DE 69812112 T2 20031009; EP 1007772 A1 20000614; EP 1007772 B1 20030312

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69812112

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020516

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT