Global Patent Index - EP 1007775 A1

EP 1007775 A1 2000-06-14 - LONG FIBER-FOAM COMPOSITE MATERIAL

Title (en)

LONG FIBER-FOAM COMPOSITE MATERIAL

Title (de)

LANGFASER-SCHAUMVERBUND

Title (fr)

COMPOSITE MOUSSE-FIBRES LONGUES

Publication

EP 1007775 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941244 A

Priority

  • DE 9801777 W
  • DE 19737014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19737014A1] The invention relates to a long fiber-foam composite material, in which the long fibers are bonded to form a loose but dimensionally stable structure with good recovery properties. The long fibers are only partially bonded by foam particles in the shape of nodal points. The foamed or unfoamed foam particles are applied to the structure when the latter is being formed. The unfoamed foam particles applied to the structure are foamed by reacting or reactivating the blowing agent previously applied to the bonding agent to be foamed. The expansion can freely take place without limiting the volume so that a minimal possible thickness can be obtained by complete expansion or in a predetermined volume having a predetermined thickness, for instance, by expansion in a double wall press or a mold.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/68 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910581A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737014 A1 19990304; AU 8972098 A 19990316; CA 2302006 A1 19990304; EP 1007775 A1 20000614; EP 1007775 B1 20011121; WO 9910581 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070629

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MOLLER PLAST G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-10-06 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802757 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL