Global Patent Index - EP 1007776 B1

EP 1007776 B1 2002-09-25 - WET GRINDING METHOD FOR TEXTILE MATERIAL AND RELATIVE DEVICE

Title (en)

WET GRINDING METHOD FOR TEXTILE MATERIAL AND RELATIVE DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM NASSSCHMIRGELN VON TEXTILGUT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ABRASION HUMIDE DE MATIERE TEXTILE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1007776 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924518 A

Priority

  • IB 9800970 W
  • IT UD970116 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901602A1] Wet grinding method for textile material, applicable to textile material of cotton, wool, synthetic material, elasticised material and similar, used to give to the touch of the fabric particular aesthetic effects such as the ageing effect, the pre-washed effect, the "peach fuzz" effect, the method providing a preliminary step performed upstream of the grinding step wherein the fabric (11) is wet or dumped, the grinding step being performed by causing the fabric (11), maintained under tension between a drawing element at inlet (18) and a drawing element at outlet (24), to pass around a plurality of rotary grinding cylinders (22) distributed on the circumference of a rotary drum (21) and lined with material having abrasive properties. Wet grinding device for textile material, which can be used on textile material of cotton, wool, synthetic material, elasticised material and similar, used to give to the touch of the fabric particular aesthetic effects such as the ageing effect, the pre-washed effect, the "peach fuzz" effect, the device comprising means to wet or damp the advancing fabric (11) arranged upstream of the grinding assembly (19), the grinding assembly (19) comprising a plurality of rotary grinding cylinders (22) distributed on the circumference of a rotary drum (21), the device comprising at least a drawing element at inlet (18) and a drawing element at outlet (24) of the fabric (11), the grinding cylinders (22) being lined with material having abrasive properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0649928 A2 19950426 - SPEROTTO RIMAR SPA [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901602 A1 19990114; AT 224970 T 20021015; AU 7671098 A 19990125; DE 69808309 D1 20021031; DE 69808309 T2 20030731; EP 1007776 A1 20000614; EP 1007776 B1 20020925; ES 2185168 T3 20030416; IT 1295158 B1 19990430; IT UD970116 A1 19981230; IT UD970116 D0 19970630; PT 1007776 E 20030829

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050623

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-06-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050622

2004-07-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040701

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-22 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185168 T3

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021226

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808309 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224970 T 20021015

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI PT