Global Patent Index - EP 1007787 A1

EP 1007787 A1 2000-06-14 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-LAYERED TISSUE PAPER PRODUCTS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-LAYERED TISSUE PAPER PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRSCHICHTIGEN SEIDENPAPIERPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ARTICLES EN PAPIER DE SOIE MULTICOUCHES

Publication

EP 1007787 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930968 A

Priority

  • DE 19732735 A
  • IB 9801092 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732735A1] A process for producing multi-layered tissue paper products with increased softness comprises the following process steps: production of layered webs of tissue paper, assembly of the layered webs to form a multi-layered web of product which is untreated with respect to softness, and printing of the web of product in the dry state with a softening lotion having the following minimum composition in percent by weight: a quaternary ammonium compound 3 to 30 %, siloxane foam suppressor 0.1 to 3.0 %, aloe vera powder 0.1 to 10 % a polyhydroxy softener, in particular polyethylene glycol 0.05 to 5 % remainder water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/22; A61K 7/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/20 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61Q 19/10 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01); D21F 11/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/07 (2006.01); D21H 17/21 (2006.01); D21H 17/53 (2006.01); D21H 17/59 (2006.01); D21H 21/22 (2006.01); D21H 17/02 (2006.01); D21H 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/22 (2013.01); D21F 11/04 (2013.01); D21F 11/14 (2013.01); D21H 17/02 (2013.01); D21H 17/07 (2013.01); D21H 17/53 (2013.01); D21H 17/59 (2013.01); D21H 27/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906634A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732735 A1 19990204; AT 218650 T 20020615; AU 8123998 A 19990222; BR 9811719 A 20000815; CA 2298663 A1 19990211; CN 1268200 A 20000927; DK 1007787 T3 20020923; EP 1007787 A1 20000614; EP 1007787 B1 20020605; ES 2174452 T3 20021101; JP 2001512196 A 20010821; PT 1007787 E 20020930; WO 9906634 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160717

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160717

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160717

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160718

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160717

2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 218650 T

- Effective date: 20160717

2017-03-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-02-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69805810

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150716

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150708

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150708

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120717

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120717

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130204

2013-05-08 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120717

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020402347

- Effective date: 20130104

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-01-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130117

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110706

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174452 T3

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402347

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805810 20020711

2002-07-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218650 T 20020615

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010720

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE