Global Patent Index - EP 1007803 A1

EP 1007803 A1 2000-06-14 - FIRE RESISTING WALL

Title (en)

FIRE RESISTING WALL

Title (de)

FEUERFESTE WAND

Title (fr)

MUR RESISTANT AU FEU

Publication

EP 1007803 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99939795 A

Priority

  • GB 9901801 W
  • GB 9812326 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2338252A] A fire resisting wall structure, offering prolonged fire resistance at considerable heights, comprises two rows of spaced vertical supports or studs (10, 14), in which the rows of studs are separated by a central layer of fire resisting building board (11-13) to which the studs of both rows are secured, while the opposite outer faces of the studs are covered by respective facing layers of fire resisting building board (16-17) secured to the studs. The thickness of the central layer should be greater than that of either of the facing layers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01); G01N 33/564 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964690A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2338252 A 19991215; GB 2338252 B 20020424; GB 9913329 D0 19990811; AU 4278499 A 19991230; DE 69920378 D1 20041028; DE 69920378 T2 20050929; DK 1007803 T3 20050131; EP 1007803 A1 20000614; EP 1007803 B1 20040922; GB 9812326 D0 19980805; WO 9964690 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160608

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160608

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2017-01-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-01-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69920378

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150602

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920378 P 20041028

2004-10-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BPB PLC

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWARD, PAUL, VINCENT

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-08-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWARD, PAUL, VINCENT

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWARD, PAUL, VINCENT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE