Global Patent Index - EP 1007814 A1

EP 1007814 A1 2000-06-14 - REINFORCED DOOR PROVIDED WITH FIXING HOOKS SUPPORTED BY THE DOOR COUNTERFRAME

Title (en)

REINFORCED DOOR PROVIDED WITH FIXING HOOKS SUPPORTED BY THE DOOR COUNTERFRAME

Title (de)

VERSTÄRKTE TÜR MIT AM FESTRAHMEN DER TÜR MONTIERTEN VERRIEGELUNGSHAKEN

Title (fr)

PORTE BLINDEE EQUIPEE DE GONDS DE FIXATION SUPPORTES PAR LE DORMANT RAPPORTE DE LA PORTE

Publication

EP 1007814 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926744 A

Priority

  • IT 9900169 W
  • IT MC980065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966156A1] The present invention relates to a reinforced door fixed by means of an overlapped series of hooks (11), supported inside the door frame and hooked into corresponding slots (23) located on the door sides (2a) and activated with an electric motor (18), which is controlled with the door lock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 63/14; E06B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 63/0052 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966156A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966156 A1 19991223; AT 252676 T 20031115; AU 4390499 A 20000105; DE 69912226 D1 20031127; EP 1007814 A1 20000614; EP 1007814 B1 20031022; IT MC980065 A1 19991220; IT MC980065 D0 19980619

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070610

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040322

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-10-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-01-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912226 P 20031127

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-02-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAOLINI, GIUSEPPE

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIPRIANI, RENZO

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PAOLINI, GIUSEPPE

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021014

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT