Global Patent Index - EP 1007838 A1

EP 1007838 A1 2000-06-14 - INJECTOR BASED INDUCTION DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE FUEL TANK

Title (en)

INJECTOR BASED INDUCTION DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE FUEL TANK

Title (de)

SAUGSTRAHLPUMPE ZUM FÖRDERN VON KRAFTSTOFF

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASPIRATION A BASE DE POMPE A JET POUR RESERVOIR DE CARBURANT DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1007838 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97942078 A

Priority

  • FR 9701672 W
  • FR 9611739 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2753748A1] The invention concerns an injector or venturi for the induction of fuel in a motor vehicle fuel tank comprising an injection duct (20) receiving an injected delivery provided with a jet at its outlet, in line with a venturi tube (14) connected to the outlet (18) of the device delivering a transferred flow, an inlet (13) through which flows the sucked in delivery emerging between the jet and the venturi tube (22, 14), characterised in that the jet (22) which receives the injected delivery is formed of a nozzle of variable cross section depending on the pressure and the injected delivery Qi.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/02; F04F 5/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/02 (2006.01); F04F 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04F 5/461 (2013.01); F02M 37/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9813599A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2753748 A1 19980327; FR 2753748 B1 19981211; DE 69713166 D1 20020711; DE 69713166 T2 20021212; EP 1007838 A1 20000614; EP 1007838 B1 20020605; WO 9813599 A1 19980402

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060924

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060924

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2005-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69713166 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990412

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT