Global patent index - EP 1007856 A1

EP 1007856 A1 2000-06-14 - ROTATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

ROTATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

ROTATIONSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE ROTATION

Publication

EP 1007856 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98934122 A

Priority

  • SE 9801409 W
  • SE 9703172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914506A1] Device (1) in connection with a rotation actuator for limiting a rotational movement of the actuator shaft (10) and including at least one rotation stop element (3, 3') which is adjustable and fixable in the rotational direction and which is contained inside a rotation stop housing (2, 2'). The invention is distinguished by the rotation stop housing comprising a first portion (2'), which is adjustable in the rotational direction and fixable with respect to the rotational actuator housing, the rotation stop element (3', 4') being rigidly connected to said adjustable portion (2') of the rotation stop housing, and the first portion (2') being adjustable with respect to a fastening portion (17) which may be a part which is connectable to the rotational actuator housing or an integral part of the rotational actuator housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/12 (2006.01); F15B 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/12 (2013.01); F15B 15/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914506A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914506 A1 19990325; DE 69815535 D1 20030717; DE 69815535 T2 20040513; EP 1007856 A1 20000614; EP 1007856 B1 20030611; JP 2001516855 A 20011002; SE 510354 C2 19990517; SE 9703172 D0 19970903; SE 9703172 L 19990304

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69815535

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-06-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT