Global Patent Index - EP 1007884 A1

EP 1007884 A1 2000-06-14 - METHOD FOR THE THERMAL UTILIZATION OF SPENT GRAIN

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE THERMAL UTILIZATION OF SPENT GRAIN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM THERMISCHEN VERWERTEN VON BIERTREBERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE VALORISATION THERMIQUE DE LA DRECHE

Publication

EP 1007884 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97911953 A

Priority

  • AT 9700250 W
  • AT 202296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9822751A1] In this method for the thermal utilization of wet spent grains (1), the wet spent grains (1) are pre-dried mechanically in a first drying stage (2). In a further drying stage (4), they are thermally dried, and finally thermally utilized by burning or gasification. In order for such a method to be economically practicable, in the further drying stage (4), the mechanically dehydrated malt spent grains (15) are heated with the aid of a flue gas stemming from the energy system of a brewery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/04; F23G 5/027; F23G 5/46; F23G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/00 (2006.01); C12F 3/06 (2006.01); F23G 5/027 (2006.01); F23G 5/04 (2006.01); F23G 5/46 (2006.01); F23G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/027 (2013.01); F23G 5/04 (2013.01); F23G 5/46 (2013.01); F23G 7/10 (2013.01); F23G 2201/10 (2013.01); F23G 2201/20 (2013.01); F23G 2201/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9822751A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9822751 A1 19980528; AT 211238 T 20020115; AT 404253 B 19981027; AT A202296 A 19980215; AU 4934397 A 19980610; BG 103481 A 20000331; BG 63514 B1 20020329; BR 9713369 A 20000125; CN 1135322 C 20040121; CN 1244908 A 20000216; DE 59705928 D1 20020131; DK 1007884 T3 20020415; EP 1007884 A1 20000614; EP 1007884 B1 20011219; ES 2170376 T3 20020801; HU 0000151 A2 20000628; HU 0000151 A3 20001128; HU 226171 B1 20080528; ID 22287 A 19990930; JP 2001504205 A 20010327; JP 3963481 B2 20070822; PL 188043 B1 20041130; PT 1007884 E 20020531; RO 118680 B1 20030829; SI 20034 A 20000229; TR 9901798 T2 19991021; US 6167636 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121118

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2014-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2014-03-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140304

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121118

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121118

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59705928

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20020401027

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121118

2013-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121118

2013-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130520

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-08-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121118

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121118

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 211238

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121118

2013-07-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-06-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ZIEMANN ENERGY G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-05-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130520

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111104

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111116

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110916

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101117

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100114 AND 20100120

2009-12-21 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ZIEMANN ENERGY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-12-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-12-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2009-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ZIEMANN ENERGY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20090925

2009-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2009-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ZIEMANN ENERGY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2004-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20031016

2004-04-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20031016

2004-01-02 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE THERMAL UTILIZATION OF SPENT GRAIN

2003-12-17 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI2

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE THERMAL UTILIZATION OF SPENT GRAIN

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BABCOCK-BSH GMBH

2002-11-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BABCOCK-BSH GMBH

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2170376

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020401027

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59705928

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-31

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 211238

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-04-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE THERMAL UTILIZATION OF SPENT GRAIN

2001-03-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE THERMAL UTILIZATION OF SPENT GRAIN

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990621

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE