Global Patent Index - EP 1007967 A2

EP 1007967 A2 2000-06-14 - METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING LIGAND SPECIFIC BINDING MOLECULES

Title (en)

METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING LIGAND SPECIFIC BINDING MOLECULES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG LIGANDSPEZIFISCHER BINDUNGSMOLEKÜLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER DES MOLECULES DE LIAISON PRESENTANT UNE AFFINITE SPECIFIQUE POUR DES LIGANDS

Publication

EP 1007967 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98938377 A

Priority

  • US 9816280 W
  • US 90582597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906834A2] The present invention provides a method for identifying a binding molecule having selective affinity for a ligand. The method consists of selectively immobilizing a diverse population of binding molecules to a solid support, simultaneously contacting the diverse population immobilized on the solid support with two or more ligands and determining at least one binding molecule which selectively binds to one or more of the ligands. The invention additionally provides a method for identifying an antibody having selective affinity for a tumor antigen. The method consists of selectively immobilizing a diverse population of antibodies to a solid support, simultaneously contacting the diverse population immobilized on the solid support with two or more tumor antigens and determining at least one antibody which selectively binds to one or more of the tumor antigens. The invention also provides an isolated binding polypeptide selective for a tumor antigen. Further provided by the present invention is a Complementarity Determining Region (CDR) or functional fragment thereof of an antibody selective for a tumor antigen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/30 (2013.01); C07K 16/00 (2013.01); G01N 33/6857 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906834A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906834 A2 19990211; WO 9906834 A3 19990514; AU 8691398 A 19990222; EP 1007967 A2 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-03-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032259

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020829

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: APPLIED MOLECULAR EVOLUTION, INC.

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020829

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WATKINS, JEFFRY, D.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUSE, WILLIAM, D.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, HERREN

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI