Global patent index - EP 1007975 A2

EP 1007975 A2 2000-06-14 - SPORT MONITORING SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AIRTIME, SPEED, POWER ABSORBED AND OTHER FACTORS SUCH AS DROP DISTANCE

Title (en)

SPORT MONITORING SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AIRTIME, SPEED, POWER ABSORBED AND OTHER FACTORS SUCH AS DROP DISTANCE

Title (de)

SPORT-ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON LUFTZEIT, GESCHWINDIGKEIT, ABSORBIERTER LEISTUNG, UND ANDERER GRÖSSEN WIE FALLHÖHE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MESURE SPORTIVE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LE TEMPS DANS L'AIR, LA VITESSE, LA PUISSANCE ABSORBEE ET D'AUTRES FACTEURS TELS QUE LA HAUTEUR DE CHUTE

Publication

EP 1007975 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98928854 A

Priority

  • US 9811268 W
  • US 86708397 A
  • US 7725198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854581A2] The invention detects the loft time, speed, power and/or drop distance of a vehicle, such as a sporting vehicle, during activities of moving and jumping. A loft sensor detects when the vehicle leaves the ground and when the vehicle returns to the ground. A controller subsystem converts the sensed information to determine a loft time. A display shows the recorded loft time to a user of the system. In addition, a speed sensor can detect the vehicle's speed for selective display to the user. A power sensing section informs the user of expended energy, which can be compared to other users. A drop distance sensing unit informs the user of the peak height of a jump, during an airtime. Gaming on the internet is facilitated to connect worldwide sport enthusiasts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01P 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63K 3/00 (2006.01); G01P 3/42 (2006.01); G01P 3/50 (2006.01); G07C 1/24 (2006.01); G01S 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01P 3/42 (2013.01); G01P 1/122 (2013.01); G01P 3/50 (2013.01); G06K 9/00342 (2013.01); G01S 11/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854581 A2 19981203; WO 9854581 A3 19990318; WO 9854581 A9 19990422; AU 8055298 A 19981230; CA 2291701 A1 19981203; EP 1007975 A2 20000614; EP 1007975 A4 20020410

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040103

2002-04-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 04F 10/00 A, 7G 01P 3/50 B, 7G 01P 13/00 B, 7G 04F 8/08 B, 7G 01C 22/00 B

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHATRAT TECHNOLOGY INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 04F 10/00 A

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE