Global Patent Index - EP 1007976 A1

EP 1007976 A1 2000-06-14 - METHOD FOR MEASURING THE YAW VELOCITY OF A VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MEASURING THE YAW VELOCITY OF A VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES FAHRZEUGES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA VITESSE DE LACET D'UN VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1007976 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 96912074 A

Priority

  • FR 9600522 W
  • FR 9504156 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9631783A1] A method for measuring the yaw velocity ( psi ) of a vehicle (1), wherein a continuous evaluation of said velocity, provided by an on-board unit (2), is periodically updated using indications V1, D1 and Vt that correspond to the forward velocity of the vehicle (1), the longitudinal distance between the vehicle and a fixed obstacle lying in its path, and the relative cross-velocity of said fixed obstacle (17) relative to the vehicle, respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01P 3/44; G01P 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01P 3/44 (2006.01); G01P 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01P 3/44 (2013.01); G01P 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9631783A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9631783 A1 19961010; DE 69625721 D1 20030213; DE 69625721 T2 20031023; EP 1007976 A1 20000614; EP 1007976 B1 20030108; FR 2732764 A1 19961011; FR 2732764 B1 19970509; JP H11508993 A 19990803; US 5930739 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69625721

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020326

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971008

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT