Global Patent Index - EP 1008006 A1

EP 1008006 A1 2000-06-14 - MICROSCOPE COMPRISING AN EXCHANGEABLE INTERMEDIATE TUBE

Title (en)

MICROSCOPE COMPRISING AN EXCHANGEABLE INTERMEDIATE TUBE

Title (de)

MIKROSKOP MIT AUSWECHSELBAREM ZWISCHENTUBUS

Title (fr)

MICROSCOPE A TUBE INTERMEDIAIRE ECHANGEABLE

Publication

EP 1008006 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926433 A

Priority

  • DE 19828548 A
  • EP 9903647 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828548A1] The invention relates to a microscope comprising an exchangeable intermediate tube which is placed in the position of the tube lens between the microscope objective and an ocular observation element and which can be adjusted in a defined manner with regard to the height thereof. The microscope also comprises transmission optics having an essentially constant back focus comprised of, in a direction of observation, a first lens group of a long focal length, preferably greater than 10 m, and of a second lens group of a short focal length whose common focal length corresponds to the focal length of a standard tube lens, preferably of about 164 mm, whereby the distance between the first and second lens group can be adjusted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 21/02 (2006.01); G02B 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 21/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000862A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828548 A1 20000113; DE 19828548 C2 20010201; EP 1008006 A1 20000614; JP 2002519730 A 20020702; NO 20000883 A 20000223; NO 20000883 D0 20000223; US 6327080 B1 20011204; WO 0000862 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031258

2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040723

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2000-07-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB NL SE

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB NL SE