Global Patent Index - EP 1008016 A1

EP 1008016 A1 2000-06-14 - ALIGNING DEVICE

Title (en)

ALIGNING DEVICE

Title (de)

AUSRICHTVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT

Publication

EP 1008016 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945780 A

Priority

  • DE 9702459 W
  • DE 19643626 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818053A1] The invention relates to an aligning device (10) for individual sheet (12) alignment. The aligning device (10) comprises a sensor device (22, 24, 26, 28), a feeding device (18), a conveyor device (14) located downstream from the feeding device in the direction of conveyance of the sheet (12). In order to align the sheet (12) the sensor device (22, 24, 26, 28) detects the side end of sheet so that its position can be determined in relation to a desired printing position. The conveyor device (14) holding the sheet (12) is shifted in relation to the direction (16) in which the sheet (12) is conveyed so that the sheet (12) can be moved into the desired printing position. Before the sheet is aligned (12) the feeding device (18), which feeds the sheet (12) to the conveyor device (14), is opened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; B65H 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/10 (2006.01); B65H 9/06 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/006 (2013.01); B65H 5/062 (2013.01); B65H 7/10 (2013.01); G03G 15/6567 (2013.01); B65H 2404/144 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1523 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/514 (2013.01); B65H 2553/412 (2013.01); B65H 2553/416 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1315 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00561 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00721 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2701/1315 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9818053A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818053 A1 19980430; DE 19781181 D2 19991223; EP 1008016 A1 20000614; EP 1008016 B1 20020109; US 6135446 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59706144

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH, 85586 POING, DE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706144

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081022

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081022

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071019

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706144 20020228

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990518

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB