Global patent index - EP 1008061 A4

EP 1008061 A4 2000-06-14 - SYSTEM FOR VIRTUALLY CONVERTING DATA

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR VIRTUALLY CONVERTING DATA

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR VIRTUELLEN DATENKONVERSION

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CONVERSION VIRTUELLE DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1008061 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97920260 A

Priority

  • US 9705870 W
  • US 62960496 A
  • US 83376397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9738379A1] A software system for virtualizing arbitrary data, permitting a program to operate upon data of a format other than it is designed. This provides a novel solution to the problem the quickly approaching turn of the century will have on software system that were not designed to handle dates beyond the year 2000. The item of data come from any type of data source such as data files or computer screen memory. The present invention operates by serving a link between the program conversion process (element 44 and 46) and the data file conversion process. The present invention assumes control each time a converted program (element 30) reads or writes a record of a data file that has not yet been converted. Converting records during I/O operations, enables a converted program to access an unconverted data file as if it were converted. The invention converts the data fields in a record to a new format (element 40) that is implementation specific before passing it on to the program. In the converted program, the data is defined in the new format which the program expects to see. Unconverted programs (element 28) continue to access the actual unconverted data file (element 32). Thus, the present invention provides the converted program with a virtual converted view of an unconverted data file, the invention similarly converts data having the desired format to data having the old format before writing records to an unconverted data file.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 9/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 8/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] HART J M ET AL: "A SCALEABLE, AUTOMATED PROCESS FOR YEAR 2000 SYSTEM CORRECTION", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, 25 March 1996 (1996-03-25), pages 475 - 484, XP002050527
  • [A] LUM V Y ET AL: "A GENERAL METHODOLOGY FOR DATA CONVERSION AND RESTRUCTURING", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, vol. 20, no. 5, 1 September 1976 (1976-09-01), pages 483 - 497, XP002003089
  • See also references of WO 9738379A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9738379 A1 19971016; AU 2449497 A 19971029; AU 711020 B2 19991007; EP 1008061 A1 20000614; EP 1008061 A4 20000614; IL 126483 A 20040725; IL 126483 D0 19990817; JP 2002503361 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041111

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981102

2000-06-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19990514

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE