Global Patent Index - EP 1008068 A1

EP 1008068 A1 2000-06-14 - USER INTERFACE FOR THE SPECIFICATION OF INDEX GROUPS OVER CLASSES

Title (en)

USER INTERFACE FOR THE SPECIFICATION OF INDEX GROUPS OVER CLASSES

Title (de)

BENUTZERSCHITTSTELLE ZUM SPEZIFIZIEREN VON INDEXGRUPPEN ÜBER KLASSEN

Title (fr)

INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DE GESTION DE GROUPES D'INDEX

Publication

EP 1008068 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963287 A

Priority

  • US 9827241 W
  • US 6841597 P
  • US 10611298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933000A1] A user interface permits a programmer or other person to manage index groups for classes. The programmer enters information through the user interface to define new index groups, update defined index groups, and delete index groups. The programmer manages the index groups in the classes, and an optional mapping tool maps the defined index groups when converting data between an object model and a relational model.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30607 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933000A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933000 A1 19990701; AU 1833799 A 19990712; EP 1008068 A1 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NG, TONY CHUNG TUNG

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHARMA, RAHUL

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB