Global Patent Index - EP 1008121 A1

EP 1008121 A1 2000-06-14 - LOCKER, PARTICULARLY SUITABLE FOR HOTELS, LEISURE POOLS AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

LOCKER, PARTICULARLY SUITABLE FOR HOTELS, LEISURE POOLS AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

SCHLIESSFACH, INSBESONDERE GEEIGNET FÜR HOTELS, FREIZEIT-SCHWIMMBECKEN UND DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

ARMOIRE DE VESTIAIRE CONVENANT PARTICULIEREMENT AUX HOTELS, AUX CENTRES DE LOISIRS ET SIMILAIRE

Publication

EP 1008121 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939850 A

Priority

  • SI 9800017 W
  • SI 9700225 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912133A1] The present invention is based on the idea, how to create a locker, which will be in no doubt useful in leisure pools, hotels and other similar tourist objects, and among others e.g. also in the industry, and which handling, namely unlocking/locking should be carried out without any difficulties by using such means and in such a manner which are completely compatible and useful for handling with other means and use of these means, which are available for the user in the entire complex of activities in the environment, where the user of the locker is to be found. Such a locker comprises a framework (1) which consists of few one against each other and preferentially one above each other in rows placed drawers (2), which are all equipped with the door (21), which can be locked or unlocked by means of appropriate locking mechanism (5), whereby a card-reader (4) suitable for reading magnetic or so called chip-cards as well as a processor (4) are foreseen, by which the locking unit (52) is controlled representing together with at least one lock plate (51) at least a part of appropriate locking mechanism (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/12; E05B 63/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 61/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/12 (2006.01); G07F 17/12 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/12 (2013.01); E05B 63/121 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912133A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912133 A1 19990311; AU 8821998 A 19990322; DE 69802199 D1 20011129; DE 69802199 T2 20020606; DK 1008121 T3 20020218; EP 1008121 A1 20000614; EP 1008121 B1 20011024; ES 2166182 T3 20020401; PT 1008121 E 20020429; RU 2200447 C2 20030320; SI 9700225 A2 19990228

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160429

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140806

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *METRA INZENIRING D.O.O.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-05-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-04-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *METRA INZENIRING D.O.O.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-02-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2003-08-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-12 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166182

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802199

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-29

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000325

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL PT SE