Global Patent Index - EP 1008146 A4

EP 1008146 A4 2000-06-14 - MICRO GAS RHEOSTAT

Title (en)

MICRO GAS RHEOSTAT

Title (de)

MIKRO-GAS RHEOSTAT

Title (fr)

RHEOSTAT A MICRO-GAZ

Publication

EP 1008146 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97929874 A

Priority

  • US 9709962 W
  • US 65996596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747013A1] A device and method for controlling small flows of gas for satellite orientation thrusters comprises a photoetched silicon body (10) etched to provide one or more particular flow paths, and optionally filters, wherein the flow path is defined by the silicon body (10) and a sealing glass layer (11) bonded thereto. Flow is controlled through the flow path(s) by heating the body (10) to decrease the gas flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21D 1/00; H05B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 30/32 (2006.01); B64G 1/26 (2006.01); B64G 1/40 (2006.01); F02K 9/80 (2006.01); F03H 99/00 (2009.01); F15C 5/00 (2006.01); G05D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64G 1/26 (2013.01); B64G 1/402 (2013.01); F02K 9/805 (2013.01); F15C 5/00 (2013.01); B64G 1/401 (2013.01); F05D 2250/82 (2013.01); F05D 2250/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 1241867 A 19710804 - LOVELOCK JAMES EPHRAIM
  • [DA] US 4715852 A 19871229 - REINICKE ROBERT H [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9509988 A1 19950413 - RES INT INC [US]
  • [A] US 5267584 A 19931207 - SMITH RICHARD D [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 319 (P - 627) 17 October 1987 (1987-10-17)
  • [DA] PETERSEN K E: "SILICON AS A MECHANICAL MATERIAL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, vol. 70, no. 5, 1 May 1982 (1982-05-01), pages 420 - 457, XP000565139
  • [DA] ANGELL, J.B., TERRY, S.C., BARTH, P.W.: "Silicon Micromechanical Devices", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, April 1983 (1983-04-01), US, pages 36 - 47, XP002101377
  • See also references of WO 9747013A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747013 A1 19971211; CA 2257341 A1 19971211; EP 1008146 A1 20000614; EP 1008146 A4 20000614; JP 2000512780 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAROTTA CONTROLS, INC.

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020924

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981229

2000-06-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990528

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE