Global patent index - EP 1008158 A1

EP 1008158 A1 2000-06-14 - SWITCH WITH MOVING CONTACT MAKERS IN THE FORM OF SPRING TONGUES

Title (en)

SWITCH WITH MOVING CONTACT MAKERS IN THE FORM OF SPRING TONGUES

Title (de)

SCHALTER MIT DURCH FEDERZUNGEN GEBILDETEN BEWEGLICHEN KONTAKTSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR AVEC PIECES DE CONTACT MOBILES SOUS FORME DE LANGUETTES FAISANT RESSORT

Publication

EP 1008158 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97902168 A

Priority

  • DE 19602036 A
  • EP 9700109 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19602036A1] The invention relates to a switch, preferably a steering-column switch for motor vehicles, used to switch controlling currents and load currents. The object of the invention is to avoid contamination and oxidation of the contact surfaces to the greatest extent. The object is attained by transforming the sliding movement of the actuating member (26) into a movement, perpendicular relative to each other, of the contact makers (4, 5, 6, 17) with the aid of a mechanical control system (20 to 29). Further advantageous developments involve the design and the mounting of the contact makers, and the structure of the mechanical control system and a process for assembly of the switch according to the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/00; H01H 11/06; H01H 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 11/06 (2006.01); H01H 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 15/102 (2013.01); H01H 11/0056 (2013.01); H01H 11/06 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9726671A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19602036 A1 19970724; DE 19602036 B4 20040205; EP 1008158 A1 20000614; EP 1008158 B1 20030416; ES 2191819 T3 20030916; US 6087603 A 20000711; WO 9726671 A1 19970724

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100112

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110224

2011-03-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100111

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090109

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191819

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59709879

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SCHALTER UND SENSOREN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980820

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT