Global Patent Index - EP 1008175 A4

EP 1008175 A4 2000-10-18 - CAPPED INTERLAYER DIELECTRIC FOR CHEMICAL MECHANICAL POLISHING

Title (en)

CAPPED INTERLAYER DIELECTRIC FOR CHEMICAL MECHANICAL POLISHING

Title (de)

BEDECKTE DIELEKTRISCHE ZWISCHENSCHICHT ZUM CHEMISCH-MECHANISCHEN SCHLEIFEN

Title (fr)

COUCHE INTERMEDIAIRE DIELECTRIQUE COIFFEE POUR POLISSAGE CHIMICO-MECANIQUE

Publication

EP 1008175 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96933088 A

Priority

  • US 9615201 W
  • US 53600795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9712393A1] A method of forming a novel high density interconnection structure. According to the present invention, first an insulating layer (206) is formed over a semiconductor substrate. The first insulating layer is then planarized. Next, a second insulating layer (212) is formed above the first planarized insulating layer. An opening is then etched through the first and second insulating layers. A conductive material (226) is then deposited into the opening and onto the top surface of the second insulating layer. Next, the conductive material is polished back from the second insulating layer so as to form a conductively filled opening which is substantially planar with the second insulating layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/28 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01); H01L 21/768 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/76801 (2013.01); H01L 21/76828 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] US 5340370 A 19940823 - CADIEN KENNETH C [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0540321 A1 19930505 - SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 082 (E - 0889) 15 February 1990 (1990-02-15)
  • See also references of WO 9712393A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9712393 A1 19970403; AU 7164596 A 19970417; CN 1203697 A 19981230; EP 1008175 A1 20000614; EP 1008175 A4 20001018; IL 123749 D0 19981030; JP H11512877 A 19991102; TW 304297 B 19970501

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028677

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980428

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT