Global Patent Index - EP 1008205 A1

EP 1008205 A1 2000-06-14 - TERMINAL BLOCK FOR CONNECTING INSULATED CONDUCTORS WITHOUT STRIPPING

Title (en)

TERMINAL BLOCK FOR CONNECTING INSULATED CONDUCTORS WITHOUT STRIPPING

Title (de)

REIHENKLEMME ZUM ABISOLIERUNGSFREIEN ANSCHLUSS ISOLIERTER LEITER

Title (fr)

BORNE SERRE-FILS POUR LE RACCORDEMENT SANS DENUDAGE DE CONDUCTEURS ISOLES

Publication

EP 1008205 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98944976 A

Priority

  • DE 9801916 W
  • DE 19737947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19737947A1] The invention concerns a terminal block comprising an insulating box and a connecting device for an insulated conductor (8), connected by elastic return, without stripping, between a cutting edge (6) and an opposite support. In order to maintain a slight width in the junction direction, the cutting edge (6) extends in said direction, the conductor being inserted, in its connecting position, in its longitudinal direction and perpendicular to the cutting edge (6). The opposite support (7) can also be a cutting edge, the two cutting edges being mutually mobile without lateral offset, like pincers. The connection device can have a cage tension spring (2) or a single-piece pincers-like terminal clip with C-shaped cross-section, made of an elastic material, whereof the bevels facing each other are shaped like cutting edges. Another embodiment consists in that the connection device has a pincers system with substantially C-shaped cross-section, whereof the branches fit into each other in articulation and in a limited way, and have independent springs. The length of the cutting edge(s) can be less than the diameter of the insulating sleeve (9) of the conductor to be connected, so as to obtain less cutting force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4845 (2013.01); H01R 4/2404 (2013.01); H01R 4/4836 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912233A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737947 A1 19990304; EP 1008205 A1 20000614; EP 1008205 B1 20020605; WO 9912233 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2004-07-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR