Global patent index - EP 1008277 A2

EP 1008277 A2 2000-06-14 - SOUND PICKUP DEVICE, SPECIALLY FOR A VOICE STATION

Title (en)

SOUND PICKUP DEVICE, SPECIALLY FOR A VOICE STATION

Title (de)

SCHALLAUFNAHMEEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE SPRECHSTELLE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR ACOUSTIQUE, NOTAMMENT POUR UN APPAREIL D'AMPLIFICATION VOCALE

Publication

EP 1008277 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98928096 A

Priority

  • DE 9800912 W
  • DE 19714748 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846043A2] The invention relates to a sound pickup device for a voice station. Sound is emitted from a sound source, picked up by at least two sound sensors (2) and converted into electrical signals. The sound sensors (2) at located at a distance from a reference position (1) which corresponds to an ideal set position. Directional vectors (4) located between said reference position (1) and the sound sensors (2) indicate different directions. The sound sensors (2) are electrically or acoustically connected to a common signal amplitude add device (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/40 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/005 (2013.01); H04R 1/406 (2013.01); H04R 2201/401 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846043A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846043 A2 19981015; WO 9846043 A3 19990325; AT 203869 T 20010815; EP 1008277 A2 20000614; EP 1008277 B1 20010801; JP 2001519110 A 20011016; JP 4117910 B2 20080716; US 7366308 B1 20080429

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BEYER DYNAMIC GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-06-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-12-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2004-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-10-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-06

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 203869

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990902

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL