Global Patent Index - EP 1008314 A2

EP 1008314 A2 2000-06-14 - Height adjustable work table

Title (en)

Height adjustable work table

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbarer Arbeitstisch

Title (fr)

Table de travail réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 1008314 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121529 A

Priority

DE 29822188 U

Abstract (en)

A bench has a lower frame (2) with at least two outer tubes forming part of the legs, and an upper frame (7, 8) formed from a work plate with two section forming the rest of the legs which insert into the tubes. The inner tubes can be moved by tensioning cables (16) which are connected to a tensioning unit. The tensioning unit has two tensioning cables, which are guided outwards by the lower frame and connect to the upper frame.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen höhenverstellbaren Arbeitstisch mit mindestens zwei Stützbeinen gemäß dem Oberbegriff des Anspruches 1. Um sicherzustellen, daß sich einerseits die Innenrohre nicht in den Außenrohren verkanten und/oder klemmen können und andererseits auszuschließen, daß dann, wenn beispielsweise die Arbeitsplatte zum Transport des Arbeitstisches angehoben wird, sich dieselbe in ihrer Lage zum Untergestell verändert und somit die Innenrohre in ihrer Position in den Außenrohren verbleiben, ist der Zugeinheit eine Gegenzugeinheit mit mindestens zwei aus dem Untergestell (2) nach außen geführten und oben am Obergestell (7,8) angeschlossenen Zugseilen (16) zugeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822188 U1 19990325; EP 1008314 A2 20000614; EP 1008314 A3 20010822; US 6152049 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK NL SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI