Global Patent Index - EP 1008373 A1

EP 1008373 A1 2000-06-14 - Skibinding

Title (en)

Skibinding

Title (de)

Skibindung

Title (fr)

Fixation de ski

Publication

EP 1008373 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99811120 A

Priority

FR 9815623 A

Abstract (en)

Ski attachment comprises a stop (3) and a heel part (5), the elastic means preventing the release of these parts comprises at least a blade (6) working in buckling between two translating parts (2,4) respectively connected to the stop and the heel part.

Abstract (fr)

Fixation de ski comprenant une butée (3) et une talonnière (5), dans laquelle les moyens élastiques qui s'opposent au déclenchement de la butée et de la talonnière sont constitués d'au moins une lame (6) travaillant en flambage entre deux pièces mobiles en translation (2, 4) associées respectivement à la butée et à la talonnière. Les ressorts respectifs de déclenchement de la butée et de la talonnière sont donc remplacés par ladite lame disposée longitudinalement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08; A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01); A63C 9/08 (2012.01); A63C 9/084 (2012.01); A63C 9/085 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/0805 (2013.01); A63C 9/00 (2013.01); A63C 9/005 (2013.01); A63C 9/007 (2013.01); A63C 9/08 (2013.01); A63C 9/0842 (2013.01); A63C 9/0846 (2013.01); A63C 9/0848 (2013.01); A63C 9/08521 (2013.01); A63C 9/08571 (2013.01); A63C 9/08592 (2013.01); A63C 9/0847 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008373 A1 20000614; EP 1008373 B1 20040616; AT 269129 T 20040715; DE 69918041 D1 20040722; DE 69918041 T2 20050721; FR 2786706 A1 20000609; FR 2786706 B1 20010209; US 6454291 B1 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150831

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69918041

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071207

2006-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69918041

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI