Global Patent Index - EP 1008403 A2

EP 1008403 A2 2000-06-14 - Forging machine

Title (en)

Forging machine

Title (de)

Schmiedemaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à forger

Publication

EP 1008403 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890379 A

Priority

AT 205198 A

Abstract (en)

The forging rams (3) of the machine have separate wobble plate stroke drives consisting of a wobble plate (5) which is rotatable about a wobble axis (T) displaced parallel to the respective ram axis (S) in the forging box (1), and an associated thrust disk (9) with a spherical thrust element fitting into a spherical seating on the ram end face. The forging rams are preferably preloaded by compressive springs (13) pressing them against the respective wobble and thrust plates to produce a joint held together by force.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schmiedemaschine (1) umfaßt wenigstens zwei gegeneinander wirkende, in einem Schmiedekasten (3) längsgeführte Schmiedestempel (3), die jeweils eigene mechanische Hubantriebe und vorzugsweise Hublagenverstelleinrichtungen aufweisen. Um bei hohen Maschinensteifigkeiten und vereinfachter - Bauweise einen robusten Hubantrieb zu erreichen, bestehen die Hubantriebe aus einem Taumelscheibentrieb (5) mit einer im Schmiedekasten (1) um eine zur jeweiligen Schmiedestempelachse (S) parallel versetzte Taumelachse (T) dreh- und antreibbar, aber verschiebefest gelagerten Taumelscheibe (6) und einer der Taumelscheibe (6) zugeordneten, kugelgelenkartig an der taumelscheibenzugewandten Stirnseite des zugehörenden Schmiedestempels (3) abgestützten Druckscheibe (9), wobei vorzugsweise die Schmiedestempel (3) über Druckfedern (11) im Sinne einer kraftschlüssigen Verbindung von Taumelscheiben (6) und Druckscheiben (9) druckbeaufschlagbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 7/14 (2006.01); B21J 9/02 (2006.01); B21J 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/18 (2013.01); B21J 7/14 (2013.01); B21J 9/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008403 A2 20000614; EP 1008403 A3 20010905; EP 1008403 B1 20030319; AT 406647 B 20000725; AT A205198 A 19991215; DE 59904611 D1 20030424; US 6240759 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904611

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GFM BETEILIGUNGS- UND MANAGEMENT GMBH & CO KG

- Free text: GFM BETEILIGUNGS- UND MANAGEMENT GMBH & CO KG#ENNSER STRASE 14#4403 STEYR (AT) -TRANSFER TO- GFM BETEILIGUNGS- UND MANAGEMENT GMBH & CO KG#ENNSER STRASE 14#4403 STEYR (AT)

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-02-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904611 P 20030424

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-03-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 7/14 A, 7B 21J 7/16 B, 7B 21J 9/18 B, 7B 30B 1/26 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI