Global Patent Index - EP 1008420 A2

EP 1008420 A2 2000-06-14 - Nonwoven abrasive material roll

Title (en)

Nonwoven abrasive material roll

Title (de)

Schleifvliesmaterialrolle

Title (fr)

Rouleau de matériau abrasif non tissé

Publication

EP 1008420 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00103427 A

Priority

  • EP 96929809 A
  • US 52095495 A
  • US 58610296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707937A2] A longitudinally extending web of lofty nonwoven abrasive surface treatment material is provided in a coreless roll form to the end user. Successive wraps of the nonwoven abrasive material have interengaging surfaces sufficient to maintain the material in a spirally wrapped configuration yet being readily separable. A plurality of longitudinally spaced and laterally disposed perforations through the web permit the user to successively separate the web into a plurality of sheets of abrasive surface treatment material. In a preferred embodiment, the roll is encased in a protective shrink wrap sheath, and each sheet is separated from the roll by separating said sheet from an innermost wrap of the roll. In another preferred embodiment, the abrasive surface treatment material includes abrasive particles of 1000 grade of finer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 11/00; A47L 13/17; B24D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/07 (2006.01); A47L 13/17 (2006.01); A47L 17/08 (2006.01); B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 15/04 (2006.01); B65H 18/28 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/70 (2012.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/413 (2013.01); A47L 13/07 (2013.01); A47L 13/17 (2013.01); A47L 17/08 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 11/008 (2013.01); B24D 15/04 (2013.01); B65H 18/28 (2013.01); D04H 1/70 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1846 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707937 A2 19970306; WO 9707937 A3 19970605; AU 6906896 A 19970319; BR 9609860 A 19990316; CA 2229810 A1 19970306; DE 29623899 U1 20000727; DE 69612387 D1 20010510; DE 69612387 T2 20010809; DE 69628949 D1 20030807; DE 69628949 T2 20040513; DE 69628950 D1 20030807; DE 69628950 T2 20040513; EP 0847322 A2 19980617; EP 0847322 B1 20010404; EP 1005957 A2 20000607; EP 1005957 A3 20011205; EP 1005957 B1 20030702; EP 1008420 A2 20000614; EP 1008420 A3 20011205; EP 1008420 B1 20030702; ES 2198236 T3 20040201; ES 2198237 T3 20040201; FI 980432 A0 19980225; FI 980432 A 19980225; JP 4004067 B2 20071107; JP H11514936 A 19991221; MX 9801600 A 19980830

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150830

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150830

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69628950

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140808

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080830

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198237 T3

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628950 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0847322 P

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARNARD, C., MATHEW, C/O MINN. MINING & MANUF. CO.

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANF, CHARLIE, A. C/O MINN. MINING & MANUF. CO.

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOREN, LOUIS, S. C/O MINN. MINING & MANUF. CO.

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPENCER, DOUGLAS, S. C/O MINN. MINING & MANUF. CO

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINDISCH, LAURIE, A. C/O MINN. MINING & MANUF. CO

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-06-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 847322

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI