Global Patent Index - EP 1008422 A2

EP 1008422 A2 2000-06-14 - Method and device for handheld machine tools to prevent accidents caused by tool blockage

Title (en)

Method and device for handheld machine tools to prevent accidents caused by tool blockage

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Vermeidung von Unfällen bei handgeführten Werkzeugmaschinen durch Werkzeugblockieren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour machines portatives pour éviter des accidents causés par un blocage d'outil

Publication

EP 1008422 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811119 A

Priority

DE 19857061 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves measuring the motion of the tool in space at two or more separate points (1a,1b) on the tool that are also separate from the tool axis. One of the two measurement signals is subtracted from the other before computing a signal for triggering a tool interrupt device (5). An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for preventing accidents with hand-held power tools caused by tool locking.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren und die Einrichtung zur Vermeidung von Unfällen durch Werkzeugblockieren beim Arbeiten mit einer handgeführten Werkzeugmaschine (M) mit rotierendem Werkzeug (8), z.B. Bohrhammer, die mit einer Unterbrechereinrichtung (5, 6) zum Unterbrechen der Wirkung des Antriebsmotors (7) auf das Werkzeug (8) in Abhängigkeit von dem durch eine Bewegungsmeßeinrichtung (1) erfaßten Betriebszustand ausgerüstet ist, zeichnen sich erfindungsgemäß dadurch aus, daß die Bewegungsmeßeinrichtung vorzugsweise zwei Beschleunigungssensoren (1a, 1b) aufweist, deren Meßwerte (a1, a2) vor einer weiteren Signalauswertung subtrahiert werden. Dadurch lassen sich auch Blokkierunfälle bei schräger oder verzogener Werkzeugachse sicher detektieren und außerdem wird die Erdbeschleunigung als Störgröße für jede mögliche Anwendungsposition der Werkzeugmaschine kompensiert. Bei der Auswertung des Beschleunigungssignals im Falle des Werkzeugblockierens werden damit den momentanen Maschinenzustand genauer beschreibenden Meßsignale genutzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/00 (2013.01); B25D 2211/003 (2013.01); B25D 2250/221 (2013.01); Y10T 408/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008422 A2 20000614; EP 1008422 A3 20010919; EP 1008422 B1 20070214; CN 1160526 C 20040804; CN 1256383 A 20000614; DE 19857061 A1 20000615; DE 19857061 C2 20001102; DE 59914191 D1 20070329; JP 2000263304 A 20000926; JP 4486728 B2 20100623; US 6111515 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151201

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151202

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-05-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-03-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE

2007-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB LI NL SE

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL SE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI