Global Patent Index - EP 1008427 A1

EP 1008427 A1 2000-06-14 - Chipping machine

Title (en)

Chipping machine

Title (de)

Zerspaner

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteuse

Publication

EP 1008427 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122417 A

Priority

EP 98122417 A

Abstract (en)

The chipping machine has a chipping member (rotor) (3) which is rotatably mounted on a housing (2). The housing has an inlet (2.1) for the goods to be chipped. The housing also has a chip collecting space (ring channel)(2.2) with an outlet. The inlet includes a strain gauge (4) which is fixed to a solid component at one end and to a wall at the other end, the wall being subjected to the flow of goods. The inlet has an impact plate for guiding the goods. The strain gauge is preferably attached to the impact plate. The moisture of the goods may be detected using an inductive sensor.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Zerspaner zum Herstellen von Spänen aus Hackschnitzeln, insbesondere Messerringzerspaner; mit einem Gehäuse; mit einem im Gehäuse drehbar gelagerten Zerspanungsorgan; mit einem dem Gehäuse zugeordneten Einlaß (2.1) für das zu zerspanende Gut; mit einem dem Gehäuse zugeordneten Spänesammelraum mit Auslaß. Die Erfindung ist gekennzeichnet durch die folgenden Merkmale: dem Einlaß ist eine Dehnungsmeßeinrichtung (4) zugeordnet; die Dehnungsmeßeinrichtung greift einerseits an einem starren Bauteil (2.5) an und andererseits an einer Wand (2.1.1), die derart angeordnet ist, daß sie vom Gutstoffstrom beaufschlagt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] DE 19724325 C1 19990128 - MAIER ZERKLEINERUNGSTECH GMBH [DE]
  • [A] US 5477900 A 19951226 - GRAY DAVID A [US]
  • [A] US 5020579 A 19910604 - STRONG DONALD E [US]
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 8627, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class P63, AN 86-175303, XP002097212
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 8951, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class P41, AN 89-376732, XP002097213

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008427 A1 20000614; EP 1008427 B1 20030212; DE 59807199 D1 20030320; ES 2192732 T3 20031016

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807199

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091127

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-03-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110302

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: B. *MAIER ZERKLEINERUNGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192732 T3

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807199 P 20030320

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI