Global Patent Index - EP 1008438 A1

EP 1008438 A1 2000-06-14 - A structure for presses, in particular for forming ceramic products

Title (en)

A structure for presses, in particular for forming ceramic products

Title (de)

Rahmenanordnung in Pressen, insbesondere in Pressen für die Herstellung von Keramikgegenständen

Title (fr)

Châssis pour presses, en particulier pour presses utilisées dans la fabrication d'éléments en céramique

Publication

EP 1008438 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98123386 A

Priority

EP 98123386 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a structure for presses which comprises: a resistance structure constituted by at least one resistance element (1) which comprises an annular element (2) internally to which in opposite positions two segments (3) are housed. The segments (3) exhibit a first portion (30) of edge which is shaped to couple with a correspondingly-shaped portion of an internal edge of said annular element (2). The segments also exhibit a second portion (31) of edge which is opposite to the first portion (30). Spacers (4) are provided for maintaining said segments (3) at a predetermined distance one from another. A power tool (5) exerts a pressing action by compressing an object or powder material for pressing between two bodies, which power tool (5) is inserted between the facing second portion (31) of edges of said segments (3) in such a way as to transfer to said second portion (31) equal and opposite reactions resulting from said pressing action. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/04; B28B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2013.01); B30B 15/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008438 A1 20000614; EP 1008438 B1 20050309; EP 1008438 B2 20091125; DE 69829296 D1 20050414; DE 69829296 T2 20060413; DE 69829296 T3 20100512; ES 2236862 T3 20050716; ES 2236862 T5 20100305

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-03-05 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-11-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20091125

2009-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050309

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051209

2006-05-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-01-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SACMI - COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA SOC. COOP. A.

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051209

2005-09-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2236862 T3

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829296 P 20050414

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYSTEM S.P.A.

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI