Global Patent Index - EP 1008448 A1

EP 1008448 A1 2000-06-14 - Device for controlling the temperature of a printing press

Title (en)

Device for controlling the temperature of a printing press

Title (de)

Temperiervorrichtung einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler la température d'une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 1008448 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120734 A

Priority

DE 19857107 A

Abstract (en)

A temperature control device comprises tempering fluid circuit (2) with pump (4) and consumer (6) and a tempering fluid source (10) and feedline (16) to the inlet (18) into the circuit, notably at a first point (18) between consumer and pump intake (20). A fluid return (22) runs from circuit outlet (24) to a second point (24) between pump intake (20) and consumer (6) upstream of the first point (18) and so back to source (10). A slave valve (28) in line (22) is fitted as also a temperature sensor (30) in the flow circuit (2). A pressure head is set up by a flow resistance (32) circuited (2) between first and second points (18,24) so with the valve partly or completely open, part of the fluid can pass through valve (28) back to the source (10). Electronic switch control (34) sets the valve (28) and its fluid flow to the current temperature measured by the sensor (30) in order to maintain the ideal temperature at the consumer.

Abstract (de)

Temperiervorrichtung einer Druckmaschine mit einem Temperierfluidkreislauf (2), welcher eine Fluidzufuhrleitung (16,18) auf der Saugseite (20) einer in ihr enthaltenen Pumpe (4) und eine Fluidrückführleitung (22) ebenfalls auf der Saugseite der Pumpe (4) hat. Die beiden Leitungen (16,22) sind an eine Temperierflüssigkeitsquelle (10) angeschlossen. Zwischen den Anschlußstellen (18,24) der beiden Leitungen (16,22) an den Temperierfluidkreislauf (2) befindet sich in diesem ein Strömungswiderstand (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/22; B41F 7/37; B41F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/37 (2006.01); B41F 13/22 (2006.01); B41F 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/37 (2013.01); B41F 13/22 (2013.01); B41F 31/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008448 A1 20000614; EP 1008448 B1 20030108; CN 1257005 A 20000621; DE 19857107 A1 20000615; JP 2000168038 A 20000620; JP 3117689 B2 20001218; US 6289984 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903964

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-07-13 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031020

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-12-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECHNOTRANS AG

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903964 P 20030213

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALDWIN GERMANY GMBH

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000408

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI