Global patent index - EP 1008454 A1

EP 1008454 A1 2000-06-14 - Ink-jet printing process for image production

Title (en)

Ink-jet printing process for image production

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckverfahren zur Bildherstellung

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression à jet d'encre pour produire des images

Publication

EP 1008454 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123046 A

Priority

EP 98123046 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet (B) to be printed onto is supported during printing on a base (30) having drainage. Ink drops falling outside the edge of the sheet onto the base are drained away and cannot contaminate the printer or the following prints. Sheet is porous with channels (31) or honeycomb structure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Tintenstrahldruckverfahren zum Aufzeichnen von Bildinformation auf ein insbesondere blattförmiges Trägermaterial wird das Trägermaterial (B) während des Druckvorgangs auf einer Drainagemittel aufweisenden Unterlage (30) gehaltert. Auf diese Weise kann randlos gedruckt werden, wobei neben das Trägermaterial fallende Tintentropfen durch die Unterlage abgeführt werden und so die Gefahr der Verschmutzung des Druckwerks oder der nachfolgenden Bilder vermieden wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/02; B41J 2/01; B41J 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/18 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/185 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 11/02 (2006.01); B41J 11/06 (2006.01); B41J 13/10 (2006.01); B65H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/0065 (2013.01); B41J 2/01 (2013.01); B41J 11/0085 (2013.01); B41J 11/02 (2013.01); B41J 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5717446 A 19980210 - TEUMER ROGER G [US], et al
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 004 31 May 1995 (1995-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 097 (M - 134) 5 June 1982 (1982-06-05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008454 A1 20000614; EP 1008454 B1 20050323; CA 2291925 A1 20000608; CN 1256206 A 20000614; DE 59812684 D1 20050428; JP 2000168108 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081208

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051227

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT HEALTHCARE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-07-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812684

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-02-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030716

2002-12-11 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: 20021022 CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI