Global Patent Index - EP 1008457 A1

EP 1008457 A1 2000-06-14 - Ink-jet recording sheet with image-protecting layer

Title (en)

Ink-jet recording sheet with image-protecting layer

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsblatt mit einer Bildschutzschicht

Title (fr)

Feuille pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre avec une couche protectrice d'images

Publication

EP 1008457 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99309809 A

Priority

  • JP 34303798 A
  • JP 5060899 A
  • JP 6855399 A

Abstract (en)

A recording material that can be recorded by ink with water-soluble dye, particularly to provide an ink jet recording sheet provides an excellent combination of in ink absorbency, ink coloration, light resistance, water resistance and surface gloss. One such ink jet recording sheet has on an ink-receiving support an image preserving layer comprising anionic colloidal silica and zinc oxide particulates with an average particle size of about 15 to 380 nm and having a 75 degree specular glossiness of at least about 25 % at the surface. Another ink jet recording sheet has on an ink-receiving support, in succession, an image preserving layer comprising anionic colloidal silica and zinc oxide particulates with an average particle size of about 15 to 380 nm and a fixing layer comprising cationic colloidal silica and cationic polymer electrolyte.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00; B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2006.01); C10M 169/00 (2006.01); C10M 169/02 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/02 (2013.01); B41M 5/502 (2013.01); C10M 169/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/061 (2013.01); C10M 2201/0613 (2013.01); C10M 2201/062 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2229/04 (2013.01); C10M 2229/0405 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/03 (2013.01); C10N 2220/021 (2013.01); C10N 2220/082 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2250/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008457 A1 20000614; EP 1008457 B1 20030730; DE 69909947 D1 20030904; DE 69909947 T2 20040212

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091207

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909947 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI