Global patent index - EP 1008458 A1

EP 1008458 A1 2000-06-14 - Binding of a booklet of envelopes

Title (en)

Binding of a booklet of envelopes

Title (de)

Binden eines Umschlagheftes

Title (fr)

Reliure de carnet d'enveloppes

Publication

EP 1008458 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403025 A

Priority

FR 9815405 A

Abstract (en)

The envelopes in a pad (11) are joined together by one or more detachable tabs (7, 10) with perforated lines (8, 38). The tabs have notches (25) in their edges forming grooves (27) when assembled that can then be filled with beads of adhesive (28) to hold the tabs together.

Abstract (fr)

Il s'agit d'un empilement d'éléments (1) comprenant au moins une feuille, au moins un talon détachable (7) étant venu de matière avec ladite au moins une feuille selon au moins une ligne d'affaiblissement (8), les éléments étant solidarisés les uns aux autres par leurs talons. Chacun des talons comprend au moins un évidement (25), l'ensemble des évidements des talons empilés formant ainsi au moins une cheminée (27), au moins un cordon (28) de matière adhésive étant disposé dans ladite au moins une cheminée pour lier les talons entre eux. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008458 A1 20000614; FR 2786728 A1 20000609; FR 2786728 B1 20010216

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030808

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020628

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI