Global Patent Index - EP 1008463 A1

EP 1008463 A1 2000-06-14 - Writing implement

Title (en)

Writing implement

Title (de)

Schreibgerät

Title (fr)

Instrument d'écriture

Publication

EP 1008463 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121583 A

Priority

JP 85489898 A

Abstract (en)

A writing implement suitable to be used by those with handicap in their hands and/or finger(s) comprising a grip (11) having a terminal end (11b) having a curved surface adapted to contact with the palm of a user, the grip (11) being formed such that the grip (11) is held with the fingers and the palm in such a way that the grip (11) is wrapped by the hand, and a pen point (12) extending from a front end (11a) of the grip (11) with a given angle. The grip (11) can optionally have one or more concave contours adapted to fit the finger(s) of the user, wherein each concave contour can fit one or more fingers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43K 23/004

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 23/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 23/004 (2013.01); B43K 5/005 (2013.01); B43K 7/005 (2013.01); B43K 21/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008463 A1 20000614; EP 1008463 B1 20050720; DE 69926201 D1 20050825; DE 69926201 T2 20060601

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101030

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69926201

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101029

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2005-11-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926201 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MORITO CO., LTD.

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIPOD DESIGN CO., LTD.

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MORITO CO., LTD.

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIPOD DESIGN CO., LTD.

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI