Global Patent Index - EP 1008536 A1

EP 1008536 A1 2000-06-14 - Locking device for the lid of a refuse receptacle

Title (en)

Locking device for the lid of a refuse receptacle

Title (de)

Verschlusseinrichtung für den Deckel einer Mülltonne

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture pour un couvercle d'un récipient à ordures

Publication

EP 1008536 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119401 A

Priority

DE 29821868 U

Abstract (en)

The lock has a bracket (1) with a guide socket (2) and includes at least one member (23, 33) for fixing the bracket on the lid (12) so that it cannot be displaced. Preferably a hook-shaped claw (22,32) passes under the edge (13) of the bin (10) so that the bracket is fixed to the lid. The fixing member is preferably a type of pin which can be inserted in a recess (25) in the lid.

Abstract (de)

Verschlusseinrichtung (1) für den Deckel (12) einer Mülltonne (10), mit einem in der Länge veränderbaren, aber feststellbaren Bügel (1), wobei der Bügel (1) eine Führungshülse (2) aufweist, die endseitig jeweils ein Bügelelement (20, 30) mit einer hakenförmigen Kralle (32) zum Fixieren des Bügels (1) am dem Behälter (11) der Mülltonne (10) aufweist, wobei der Bügel (1) mindestens ein Element (23, 33; 24, 34) zur unverschieblichen Fixierung des Bügels (1) auf dem Deckel (12) der Mülltonne (10) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1615 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821868 U1 19990318; EP 1008536 A1 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020525

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI