Global Patent Index - EP 1008641 A2

EP 1008641 A2 2000-06-14 - Apparatus for introducing and removing emissions, in particular from coke ovens

Title (en)

Apparatus for introducing and removing emissions, in particular from coke ovens

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einleiten und Abführen von Emissionen, insbesondere aus Koksöfen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l'introduction et l'évacuation d'émissions, en particulier de fours à coke

Publication

EP 1008641 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122524 A

Priority

DE 19856747 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19856747C1] The cover band (2) is secured magnetically lengthwise to a cover band base plate (5) of the channel (1) to prevent the channel (1) opening. Apparatus for initiating and removing of emission , particularly from coke ovens has an upper side opening channel (1), a cover band (2) on the canal (1) and a band lifting device (3) which operates along the channel (4). The cover band (2) is guided into a loop (4) through the band lifting device (3).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Einleiten und Abführen von Emissionen, insbesondere aus Koksöfen mit einem oberseitig offenen Kanal (1), einem auf dem Kanal aufliegenden Abdeckband (2) und einer entlang des Kanals verfahrbaren Bandabhebeeinrichtung (3), durch die das Abdeckband (2) in einer Schlaufe (4) geführt ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist das Abdeckband (2) in Längsrichtung an einer Abdeckbandauflage (5) des Kanals magnetisch gegen ungewolltes Öffnen gesichert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 27/04 (2006.01); C10B 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 33/003 (2013.01); C10B 27/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19856747 C1 20000511; EP 1008641 A2 20000614; EP 1008641 A3 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI