Global Patent Index - EP 1008642 A1

EP 1008642 A1 2000-06-14 - Fuel compositions and additives containing polybutenes of narrow molecular weight distribution

Title (en)

Fuel compositions and additives containing polybutenes of narrow molecular weight distribution

Title (de)

Polybutene mit einer engen Molekulargewichtsverteilung enthaltende Kraftstoffzusammensetzungen und Additiven

Title (fr)

Compositions de combustibles contenant des polybutènes à distribution en poids moléculaire étroite

Publication

EP 1008642 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308399 A

Priority

US 20111398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6048373A] A fuel composition comprising a spark-ignition fuel; a Mannich detergent; and a polybutene having a molecular weight distribution of 1.4 or less.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/14; C10L 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/06 (2006.01); C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/222 (2006.01); C10L 1/234 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01); C10L 10/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 10/18 (2013.01); C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1641 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/238 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6048373 A 20000411; CA 2286233 A1 20000530; CN 1121478 C 20030917; CN 1256302 A 20000614; DE 69924078 D1 20050414; DE 69924078 T2 20060413; EP 1008642 A1 20000614; EP 1008642 B1 20050309; ID 23943 A 20000602; JP 2000160172 A 20000613; KR 100438062 B1 20040702; KR 20000035731 A 20000626; KR 20040025928 A 20040326; SG 97816 A1 20030820; TW 487730 B 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69924078

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AFTON CHEMICAL INTANGIBLES LLC

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *AFTON CHEMICAL INTANGIBLES LLC330 SOUTH FOURTH ST

- Effective date: 20050309

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *AFTON CHEMICAL INTANGIBLES LLC

- Effective date: 20050309

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061025

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061025

2006-07-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AFTON CHEMICAL INTANGIBLES LLC

2005-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69924078 P 20050414

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FUEL COMPOSITIONS AND ADDITIVES CONTAINING POLYBUTENES OF NARROW MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISTRIBUTION

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI