Global Patent Index - EP 1008672 A1

EP 1008672 A1 2000-06-14 - Platinum modified diffusion aluminide bond coat for a thermal barrier coating system

Title (en)

Platinum modified diffusion aluminide bond coat for a thermal barrier coating system

Title (de)

Durch Platin modifizierte Aluminid-Diffusionsverbundschicht für thermische Sperrschichtsysteme

Title (fr)

Couche de liaison d'aluminiure au platine obtenue par diffusion pour revêtement dit de barrière thermique

Publication

EP 1008672 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98310176 A

Priority

  • EP 98310176 A
  • JP 35556898 A

Abstract (en)

A thermal barrier coating system (20) and a method for forming the coating system (20) on a component (22) designed for use in a hostile thermal environment, such as superalloy turbine, combustor and augmentor components of a gas turbine engine. The method is particularly directed to a thermal barrier coating system (20) that includes a thermal insulating ceramic layer (26) and a diffusion aluminide bond coat (24) on which an aluminum oxide scale is grown to protect the underlying surface of the component (22) and to chemically bond the ceramic layer (26). The bond coat (24) is formed to contain an additive metal of platinum, palladium, rhodium, chromium and/or silicon, and an additive element of yttrium, and/or zirconium with possible additions of hafnium. The bond coat (24) may be formed by codepositing aluminum with the active element, or by depositing the additive metal and active element on the surface of the component (22), and then aluminizing to form the diffusion aluminide bond coat (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 28/00; F01D 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/04 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/288 (2013.01); C23C 28/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008672 A1 20000614; JP 2000178764 A 20000627; JP 3096026 B2 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090119

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040213

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI